Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Pet-Friendly Rental Dwelling Units
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain landlords a credit against the State income tax for rental dwelling units in which, during the taxable year, a landlord permits residential tenants to reside with companion animals; requiring the Comptroller to maintain and publish on the Comptroller's website a list of landlords who claim the credit and the properties at which each landlord permits tenants to reside with companion animals; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0681
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Pet-Friendly Rental Dwelling Units
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Pet-Friendly Rental Dwelling Units
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
(   10-754 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page