Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - State Funding - Revision
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the University of Maryland School of Medicine to provide clinical care at the University of Maryland Capital Region Medical Center by assigning faculty who specialize in neuroscience, obstetrics and gynecology, oncology, and vascular neurology; requiring the University of Maryland School of Medicine to provide specialized clinical care at certain rural hospitals by assigning faculty who specialize in essential areas; requiring the Governor, in fiscal years 2023 through 2025, to provide certain appropriations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0173
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0608 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges – State Funding – Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {129931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Institutions of Higher Education - State Funding - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904660/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {543722/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Institutions of Higher Education - State Funding - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Institutions of Higher Education - State Funding - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Community Colleges – State Funding – Revision
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {129931/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Institutions of Higher Education - State Funding - Revision
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Appropriations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {904660/1 Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Floor Amendment {543722/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Institutions of Higher Education - State Funding - Revision
Post Passage 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Text - Chapter - Institutions of Higher Education - State Funding - Revision
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page