Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024
Sponsored by
Senator McKay
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1044
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a resort beer license, a resort beer and wine license, and a beer, wine, and liquor festival license in Garrett County; altering the hours of sale for alcoholic beverages on Sundays for certain licenses; altering the residency requirements for certain applicants for an alcoholic beverages license in the county to require that at least one of the applicants be a resident of the State; prohibiting alcoholic beverages from being brought into places of adult entertainment and consumed or transferred; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2024
Legislative Date
1/19/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2024
Legislative Date
5/16/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1044
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2024 1/19/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Economic Matters 39AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2024 5/16/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1044
Text - Chapter - Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024
Last Updated: 5/28/2024 10:10 AM
Click to return on the top page