Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate - Real Estate Brokerage Services and Termination of Residential Real Estate Contracts (The Anthony Moorman Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a real estate broker or an escrow agent, if a purchaser terminates a certain transaction under certain circumstances, to distribute trust money to the purchaser within 30 days after a certain written notice of the termination is sent; requiring a holder of trust money who makes a certain distribution to notify the seller and purchaser of the distribution within a certain period of time; establishing that a holder of trust money may not be held liable for a certain decision to distribute the trust money; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0720
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Real Estate - Real Estate Brokerage Services and Termination of Residential Real Estate Contracts (The Anthony Moorman Act)
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page