Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Patterson, West, Guzzone, Lam, Salling, Jennings, Kelley, Jackson, Augustine, Elfreth, Ready, and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to authorize a certain employee to transport a public school student in a vehicle; and requiring, on or before December 31, 2022, the Career and Technical Education Committee to establish a pathway for students to prepare for a career as a driver and an annual goal for the number of students who obtain the appropriate license for a career as a driver before they graduate high school.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0750
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   21-211, 6-127 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page