Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Schools – Bus Driver Wages – Study
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Lam, West, Lee, Jackson, Augustine, Benson, and Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Workforce Development Board, on or before September 1, 2022, to evaluate, study, and identify certain issues relating to wages paid and benefits provided to certain bus drivers and report its findings to the governing body of each county and Baltimore City, each county board of education, including Baltimore City, the Governor, and the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0753
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Schools – Bus Driver Wages – Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883021/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Schools – Bus Driver Wages – Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233827/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {883920/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (53-83)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Schools – Bus Driver Wages – Study
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {883021/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Schools – Bus Driver Wages – Study
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Ways and Means 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {233827/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Floor Amendment {883920/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (53-83) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page