Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the House - Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of the Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation and the Maryland Clean Energy Center to enroll and participate in the health insurance benefit options established under the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to determine whether the entities are eligible to participate in the Program within 60 days of the effective date of the Act; and requiring the Secretary to submit a certain report.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0379
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223624/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {253521/1 (Delegate Mautz)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223624/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Appropriations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Floor Amendment {253521/1 (Delegate Mautz) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:55 PM
Click to return on the top page