Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Hershey, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, West, Klausmeier, and Benson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain emergency medical services providers to offer opioid overdose reversal drugs approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration to individuals who received treatment for a nonfatal drug overdose or were evaluated by a crisis evaluation team; requiring certain community services programs, certain private and public entities, and hospitals to have a protocol to offer overdose reversal drugs free of charge to certain individuals under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0408
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223422/1
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223422/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {733920/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223422/1 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223422/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223422/1 Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Floor Amendment {733920/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text - Chapter - Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Last Updated: 6/27/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page