Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Pongal Day
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim January 14 as Pongal Day, Pongal being one of the main festivals celebrating the importance of the harvest in the state of Tamil Nadu in south India, Sri Lanka, and many other countries.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0620 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Pongal Day
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Pongal Day
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   7-402, 7-402 through 7-417 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page