Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Extension and Reports
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering to July 1, 2025, the termination date for certain provisions of law governing the Minority Business Enterprise Program and its application to offshore wind projects and video lottery terminals; and altering the date by which certain reports, studies, and guidelines must be submitted.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0809
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783324/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Extension and Reports
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Favorable with Amendments {783324/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Extension and Reports
Senate 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/14/2023 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2012, 2013, 2017, 2020, 2021, 2022 )
Last Updated: 3/21/2023 11:15 AM
Click to return on the top page