Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations and Financing
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes and Guzzone
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the period of time, from 5 to 10 years, that an area may be designated as a Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise (RISE) zone; repealing the prohibition on the Secretary of Commerce from approving more than a certain number of RISE zones in a certain area; extending the termination date of the RISE Program; and requiring the Department and certain other entities to study the effectiveness of the RISE Zone Program and report to the General Assembly by December 15, 2024, on the Department's recommendations for improving the Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0471
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2023
Legislative Date
2/22/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2023
Legislative Date
2/22/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development – Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations and Financing
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2023 2/22/2023 Favorable with Amendments {233025/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2023 2/22/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development – Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations and Financing
Senate 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2023 2/24/2023 Referred Ways and Means 33AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 12:22 PM
Click to return on the top page