Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth and Bailey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to receive and process complaints involving alleged violations of certain air and water quality requirements in a certain manner; requiring the Department of the Environment to keep an electronic record of certain complaints for 10 years; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report, on or before September 30 each year, to the Governor and the General Assembly certain information relating to the enforcement of natural resources and conservation laws; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0204
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984435/1
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984435/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {880911/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {984435/1 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {984435/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 22AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {880911/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Text - Chapter - Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
(   1-305 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 11:59 AM
Click to return on the top page