Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt certain health and wellness standards for certain health care facilities; providing that certain standards may exceed the standards set by federal law; establishing the Correctional Facilities Health and Wellness Pilot Program to establish minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services for participating correctional facilities; requiring each participating facility to comply with certain health and wellness standards, offer plant-based meals, and provide certain information to inmates; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1071
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health – Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-308, 21-1301, 21-1302 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page