Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt by regulation the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code as the Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards; providing for the implementation of the Standards by the Maryland Department of Labor, local jurisdictions, counties, and municipalities; and requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to consult with the Maryland Department of Health on the implementation of the Standards in relation to the regulation of the operation and maintenance of swimming pools and spas.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0303
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0109 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-5)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {783125/1 Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (38-5) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-1201 through 12-1207 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page