Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oysters, Striped Bass, and Crabs - Commercial Authorizations - Suspensions and Revocations
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from revoking a person's authorization to catch oysters, striped bass, or crabs unless the person has been convicted of or entered an accepted plea of nolo contendere to a certain crime; altering and establishing certain procedures for the suspension or revocation of an authorization to catch oysters, striped bass, or crabs; and authorizing the Department to reinstate a certain authorization under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0725
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Reassigned to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
4 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Oysters, Striped Bass, and Crabs - Commercial Authorizations - Suspensions and Revocations
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Reassigned to Education, Energy, and the Environment 4 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page