Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Beidle, and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Feldman)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending indefinitely the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 2 renewable sources; repealing the limit on the period of time during which energy from a Tier 2 renewable source is eligible for inclusion in meeting the renewable energy portfolio standard; applying the Act to all renewable portfolio standard compliance years that begin on or after January 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0467
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2020
Legislative Date
9/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {987274/1
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {987274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {923823/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {683526/1 (Senator Hough)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/16 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {683526/1 (Senator Hough)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {683526/1 (Senator Hough) Withdrawn
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2020 9/16/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {987274/1 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {987274/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Floor Amendment {923823/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Floor Amendment {683526/1 (Senator Hough) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/16 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Floor Amendment {683526/1 (Senator Hough) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Floor Amendment {683526/1 (Senator Hough) Withdrawn 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Feldman) Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 9:10 AM
Click to return on the top page