Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Granting the Town of Mount Airy in Carroll County and Frederick County the authority to exercise urban renewal powers within an urban renewal area under Article III, Section 61 of the Maryland Constitution; and authorizing the municipality to levy certain taxes and issue general obligation bonds and revenue bonds to carry out urban renewal powers.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0561
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1385 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2023
Legislative Date
2/15/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2023
Legislative Date
2/23/2023
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2023 2/09/2023 Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2023 2/15/2023 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Favorable Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Senate 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2023 2/23/2023 Referred Environment and Transportation 32 Click to view Recorded Media
(   -, “Appendix, A1-101 through A1-114, Authority, Clearance”, for, heading, I, Renewal, Slum, Urban )
Last Updated: 2/23/2023 10:10 AM
Click to return on the top page