Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Black Bear Damage Mitigation Reimbursement Fund - Uses
Sponsored by
Senators West and McKay
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Black Bear Damage Reimbursement Fund to authorize grants from the Fund to be made for projects that mitigate damages caused by black bears and reduce conflicts between black bears and humans; renaming the Black Bear Damage Reimbursement Fund to be the Black Bear Damage Mitigation Reimbursement Fund; increasing the maximum amount of reimbursement from the Fund per person annually authorized for damage caused by black bears to $5,000; authorizing the Governor to include at least $50,000 in the annual budget bill for the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0378
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/15/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Natural Resources - Black Bear Conflict Reduction and Damage Reimbursement Fund - Uses
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2023 3/15/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable with Amendments {423024/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Black Bear Damage Mitigation Reimbursement Fund - Uses
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Environment and Transportation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/27/2023 10:44 AM
Click to return on the top page