Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations – Board Members and Executive Officers Diversity – Procurement Preference and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to establish, by regulation, a threshold and process for determining the demographics of board members and executive officers of a corporation that are similar to those of the State; requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations that require certain units of State government to establish a certain corporate diversity percentage price preference; requiring the Department to report by January 1 annually to the Board information on the racial and ethnic diversity of certain Boards of Directors; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Corporations – Board Members and Executive Officers Diversity – Procurement Preference and Reporting
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:11 PM
Click to return on the top page