Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion and Carozza
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "agritourism" to include camping and incidental outdoor stays for the purpose of a certain provision of law authorizing a local jurisdiction to adopt the definition of "agritourism".
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0558
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633223/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {633223/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text - Chapter - Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:52 PM
Click to return on the top page