Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a statewide recycling needs assessment every 10 years; requiring, by April 1, 2024, producers of certain packaging materials to individually or as part of a producer responsibility organization submit a producer responsibility plan to the Department for approval; prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2024, a producer of certain packaging materials from selling or distributing the packaging materials unless the producer has an approved producer responsibility plan; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0307
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-1702,   9-1702.2, 9-1707,   9-2401 through 9-2410 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:52 PM
Click to return on the top page