Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health - Workforce Development - Fund Established
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Behavioral Health Workforce Investment Fund to provide reimbursement for costs associated with educating, training, certifying, recruiting, placing, and retaining behavioral health professionals and paraprofessionals; providing that money expended from the Fund is supplemental to and not intended to supplant funding that would otherwise be appropriated; requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to conduct a comprehensive behavioral health workforce needs assessment on or before December 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0418
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Mental Health - Workforce Development - Fund Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2023
Legislative Date
2/22/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2023
Legislative Date
2/22/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Mental Health - Workforce Development - Fund Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Text - First - Mental Health - Workforce Development - Fund Established
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2023 2/22/2023 Favorable with Amendments {763921/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2023 2/22/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mental Health - Workforce Development - Fund Established
Senate 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2023 2/24/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 33AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/14/2023 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-1601 through 10-1603 )
Last Updated: 3/22/2023 9:17 AM
Click to return on the top page