Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman, Lee, and Sydnor
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund to include money received by the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General from a final settlement, an agreement, or a judgment relating to an investigation or enforcement of the Maryland Consumer Protection Act for an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice for rental residential property, excluding restitution and the costs of the action the Attorney General is entitled to recover.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0571
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {603025/1
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543626/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments {603025/1 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Committee Amendment Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Smith) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Smith) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Judiciary 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543626/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (97-37) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Text - Chapter - Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:52 PM
Click to return on the top page