Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone (By Request - Comptroller)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Comptroller to waive certain penalties related to abandoned property in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Referred Economic Matters 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page