Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - On-Farm Composting Facilities - Permit Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion, Hester, and Carozza
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations to exempt an on-farm composting facility from the requirement to obtain a permit if the on-farm composting facility uses 10,000 square feet of area or less for active food scrap composting, composts only certain materials, records the amount and source of off-site type 2 organics composted and the date and time the off-site type 2 organics arrived on the farm, retains the records for 5 years, provides records on request, and meets any other condition for a permit exemption; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0253
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0184 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - On-Farm Composting Facilities - Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/16/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753122/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - On-Farm Composting Facilities - Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
4/03/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
3/25/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/24/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2023
Legislative Date
5/08/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment - On-Farm Composting Facilities - Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - On-Farm Composting Facilities - Permit Exemption
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/16/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Favorable with Amendments {753122/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - On-Farm Composting Facilities - Permit Exemption
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Environment and Transportation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2023 4/03/2023 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2023 3/21/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2023 3/25/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2023 3/24/2023 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2023 5/08/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Text - Chapter - Environment - On-Farm Composting Facilities - Permit Exemption
Last Updated: 5/10/2023 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page