Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Elfreth, Guzzone, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kramer, McCray, and Smith
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 51
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying the Prevailing Wage Law to a certain contract for the construction of a public work by expanding the definition of "construction" to include services provided under a mechanical systems service contract.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0611
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
4 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-33)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Overridden (96-41)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 51
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Reassigned to Finance 4 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Economic Matters 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-33) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Overridden (31-15) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Overridden (96-41) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 51
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:47 AM
Click to return on the top page