Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Fourth Degree Sexual Offense and Spousal Defense
Sponsored by
Senators Lee and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "sexual contact"; and repealing a certain prohibition on prosecuting a person for rape or a certain sexual offense against a victim who was the person's legal spouse at the time of the alleged rape or sexual offense.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0147
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0230 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/14/2020
Legislative Date
9/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {348373/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133823/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-18)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Hough)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Hough)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/14/2020 9/14/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law – Sexual Crimes – Repeal of Spousal Defense (Love Is No Defense to Sexual Crimes)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {348373/1 Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Fourth Degree Sexual Offense and Spousal Defense
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {133823/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (115-18) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Hough) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Hough) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Refuses Recede 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 House Refuses Recede 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Shetty and Arikan) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page