Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Feldman, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for 50% of an investment made in a qualified innovation business, not to exceed $50,000, or $100,000 for a qualified investor that is a married couple filing jointly or a pass-through entity; requiring a qualified investor to meet certain requirements in order to be eligible for the credit; requiring the Department of Commerce to administer the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0360
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page