Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish a Salt Applicator Certification Program to encourage efficient winter maintenance of roadways, parking lots, and sidewalks through the use of salt or salt alternatives; requiring each commercial applicator to participate in the Program, be certified on or before October 1, 2024, and maintain a valid certification; and requiring each certified commercial applicator to maintain certain records of each salt application and submit an annual report to the Department.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0371
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-2401 through 9-2404 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page