Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Requirements and Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a school resource officer from entering a school building except if summoned by a school administrator or official to respond to an emergency involving violence or the threat of violence, to participate in certain training, or to use certain facilities; requiring a school resource officer to conceal any firearms except under certain circumstances; requiring a school resource officer to wear civilian clothing; and prohibiting a school resource officer from participating in the routine school discipline of a student.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Requirements and Prohibitions
(   7-1508 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page