Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit - Technical Correction
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone (By Request - Office of the Comptroller)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting a certain incorrect cross-reference to the federal Internal Revenue Code relating to the federal work opportunity credit.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2023
Legislative Date
1/24/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit - Technical Correction
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit - Technical Correction
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2023 1/24/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit - Technical Correction
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit - Technical Correction
Senate 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Referred Ways and Means 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 12:22 PM
Click to return on the top page