Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Natural Resources – Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on each Sunday of the deer hunting seasons in Prince George's County from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January, inclusive; and adding Prince George's County to the list of counties in which the safety zone for archery hunters extends 50 yards from a dwelling house, residence, church, or any other building or camp occupied by human beings.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0874
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0615 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Prince George’s County – Natural Resources – Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page