Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Registers of Wills – Maximum Salary – Increase
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $124,500 to $146,500, the maximum annual salary that the Board of Public Works may set for a register of wills.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0518
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Registers of Wills – Maximum Salary – Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2022
Legislative Date
1/15/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Registers of Wills – Maximum Salary – Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-3)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-30)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Registers of Wills – Maximum Salary – Increase
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Registers of Wills – Maximum Salary – Increase
Senate 1/15/2022 1/15/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Registers of Wills – Maximum Salary – Increase
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (42-3) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (103-30) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Text - Chapter - Registers of Wills – Maximum Salary – Increase
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page