Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – On–Farm Composting Facilities – Permit Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion, Carozza, and Hester
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations to exempt an on-farm composting facility from the requirement to obtain a permit if the on-farm composting facility uses 40,000 square feet of area or less for active food scrap composting, composts only certain materials, records certain information and retains the records for 3 years, and meets any other condition for a permit exemption specified in regulations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0184
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment – On–Farm Composting Facilities – Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment – On–Farm Composting Facilities – Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment – On–Farm Composting Facilities – Permit Exemption
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments {203327/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment – On–Farm Composting Facilities – Permit Exemption
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/5/2022 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page