Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Sponsored by
Senator Lam (By Request)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a certain committed person may file exceptions to a certain report of the Office of Administrative Hearings only if that person appeared at a certain release hearing; altering a provision of law to require a court to hold a certain hearing unless all parties that appeared at a certain prior hearing waive the hearing, rather than requiring the court to hold a certain hearing unless a certain committed person and the State's Attorney waive the hearing; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0728
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0731 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:09 PM
Click to return on the top page