Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering from December 31, 2022, to December 31, 2024, the date by which an energy storage system is required to be installed for purposes of eligibility for a certain credit against the State income tax for the costs of installing an energy storage system; establishing the Energy Storage System Grant Program in the Maryland Energy Administration to provide grants to certain applicants for the purchase and installation of energy storage systems; establishing the Energy Storage System Grant Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2024, July 1, 2025
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations and Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations and Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {583728/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {303527/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (47-82)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-28)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations and Extension
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Favorable 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Favorable Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations and Extension
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Referred Ways and Means 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {583728/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Floor Amendment {303527/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (47-82) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (107-28) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Last Updated: 5/12/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page