Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the Apprenticeship and Training Council in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2034, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Council.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2021
Legislative Date
9/22/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/26 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/27 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Augustine) Withdrawn
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {753725/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2021 9/22/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Senate 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Favorable 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Motion Special Order until 1/26 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Motion Special Order until 1/27 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Augustine) Withdrawn 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Floor Amendment {753725/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Referred Economic Matters 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {943820/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Text - Chapter - Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Last Updated: 4/26/2022 12:10 PM
Click to return on the top page