Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Disciplinary Actions and Procedures
Sponsored by
Senator Lam (By Request - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners to deny a license to an applicant or to take certain action against a licensee for failure to follow an order of the Board; authorizing the Board to grant a stay of enforcement of a Board order in accordance with the Administrative Procedure Act; prohibiting a Board order from being stayed pending judicial review; authorizing the Board to appeal a certain decision; and authorizing the Board to reinstate a suspended or revoked license only under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0234
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Occupations - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Disciplinary Actions and Procedures
Senate 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Favorable with Amendments {893520/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Disciplinary Actions and Procedures
Senate 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/14/2023 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/23/2023 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page