Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a certain death benefit may be awarded; providing that an application for a death benefit under the Act shall be submitted within 3 years of the finding of evidence that the death of the decedent resulted from an act committed against the decedent due to the nature and performance of the decedent's duties; and providing the Act shall be applied to and interpreted to affect the eligibility of death benefits before, on, or after July 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {103224/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Referred Appropriations 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page