Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the termination date for certain provisions of law concerning the Minority Business Enterprise Program; and altering the date by which the final report on a certain study of the Minority Business Enterprise Program is required to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee of the General Assembly to before September 30, 2023, so that the General Assembly may review the report before the 2024 Session.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-3)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (119-3) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Text - Chapter - State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
(   2012, 2013, 2017 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page