Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Licenses, Certificates, and Registrations - Lawful Presence and Identification Numbers
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a health occupations board from denying a license, certification, or registration to an immigrant if the individual meets all educational, training, or professional requirements for licensure, certification, or registration; and requiring each health occupations board to require each applicant for a license to disclose the Social Security number or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number of the applicant and record the number on the application.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0454
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0523 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493120/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-3)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Occupations - Licenses, Certificates, and Registrations - Immigrants
Senate 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Favorable with Amendments {493120/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Licenses, Certificates, and Registrations - Lawful Presence and Identification Numbers
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Third Reading Passed (40-3) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2023 3/21/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/21/2023 4:30 PM
Click to return on the top page