Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance – General Obligation Debt – Application of Minority Business Participation Goals
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a certain project that receives a certain appropriation from the State is subject to a certain minority business participation goal.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - State Finance – General Obligation Debt – Application of Minority Business Participation Goals
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:53 PM
Click to return on the top page