Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - General Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending to 30 years the maximum duration of an energy performance contract by a unit of State government.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Referred Appropriations 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Text - Chapter - Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page