Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a fiduciary institution to disclose certain financial records from a specified period of time that are requested in writing by an adult protective services program that is investigating suspected financial abuse or financial exploitation; authorizing an adult protective services agency or a law enforcement agency to share certain information with a fiduciary institution that made a report of suspected financial abuse or financial exploitation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {393226/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Referred Economic Matters 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text - Chapter - Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page