Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Autism Strategy – Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Governor's Office of Community Initiatives)
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date by which the State Coordinator for Autism Strategy must submit a certain annual report and repealing the requirement that the report be submitted to the Secretary of Disabilities; altering the membership of the Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs; requiring the Governor to designate the chair of the Advisory Stakeholder Group and establishing term requirements for the chair; and requiring the Governor's Office of Community Initiatives to provide staff to the Advisory Stakeholder Group.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2021
Legislative Date
9/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Autism Strategy – Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Autism Strategy – Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2021 9/23/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Autism Strategy – Revisions
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Autism Strategy – Revisions
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Referred Appropriations 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9.5-102, 9.5-103 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page