Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council as an independent unit of State government with the authority to conduct and support advocacy, systems change, and capacity-building efforts to promote inclusive communities and equity in services for individuals with disabilities in the State, research best practices and provide related training and technical assistance to communities in the State, and inform State and local leaders about disability issues.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0504
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2023
Legislative Date
3/27/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2023
Legislative Date
3/18/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2023
Legislative Date
4/11/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council - Establishment
Senate 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council - Establishment
Senate 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/14/2023 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2023 3/27/2023 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2023 3/18/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Returned Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2023 4/11/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text - Chapter - Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council - Establishment
(   7-12A-01 through 7-12A-04 )
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page