Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Ellis, Hester, Lam, Pinsky, and Washington
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the procedures for the canvassing of and curing of errors on absentee and provisional ballots; repealing the requirements that a certain statement of election results be by precinct and that the local boards of elections publish copies of the complete election results in a certain manner; and requiring that a certain report of election results by the State Board of Elections be reported by precinct, including reports of the early, absentee, and provisional vote; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2021
Legislative Date
10/19/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Ballots – Processing and Reporting Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453621/1
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/9 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {183823/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2021 10/19/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law – Ballots – Processing and Reporting Procedures
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453621/1 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/9 (Senator Ready) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453621/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Floor Amendment {183823/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-30) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Senate 2/14/2022 2/11/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Ready) Adopted 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Referred Ways and Means 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {823921/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-41) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page