Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, the Behavioral Health Administration within the Maryland Department of Health, the Maryland Center for School Safety, and the Department of Information Technology jointly to develop and publish a cyber safety guide and training course to be implemented in public schools beginning in the 2023-2024 school year; requiring the cyber safety guide and training course to be developed in consultation with professionals who specialize in child development and child psychology; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1410
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0231 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Senate 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   7-450 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page