Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman, Carter, Jackson, Lee, Smith, Sydnor, and Waldstreicher, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that certain procedural notice requirements must be fulfilled prior to the filing of a complaint by a landlord or a landlord's agent for the repossession of residential rental property for failure to pay rent; establishing that certain individuals shall have access to legal representation in eviction proceedings; establishing the Access to Counsel in Evictions Program to direct services to provide covered individuals with legal representation; establishing an Access to Counsel in Evictions Task Force; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0018
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Action - Right to Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {178472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Action - Right to Counsel
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {178472/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page