Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rental Vehicle Agreements - Disclosures - Spare Tires
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a motor vehicle rental company to disclose in the rental agreement whether a rental vehicle is equipped with a spare tire; and requiring a motor vehicle rental company to require a renter to initial the disclosure before renting a rental vehicle.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/10/2021
Legislative Date
9/10/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Rental Vehicle Agreements - Disclosures - Spare Tires
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/10/2021 9/10/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Rental Vehicle Agreements - Disclosures - Spare Tires
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page